Yerman, Todd Jeremy (CPSO#: 85995)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Yerman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2017