Yesovitch, Rose Paula (CPSO#: 84571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northwood Medical Clinic
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 522-3380
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rose Yesovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yesovitch ( CPSO# 84571 )

Business Address:
Northwood Medical Clinic
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
Northwood Medical Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 222-1364

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSE PAULA YESOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YESOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008