Yeung, Jensen (CPSO#: 76124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Dermatology, PERC
76 Grenville Street 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7505
Fax: (416) 323-6254
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Dermatology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M1
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Victoria Terrace Medical Building
Suite 302
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-8400
Fax: (416) 750-1091
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

K. Papp Clinical Research Inc.,
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 579-9535 Ext. 222
Fax: (519) 579-8312
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jensen Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeung ( CPSO# 76124 )

Business Address:
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 579-9535

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Dept. of Dermatology
76 Grenville Street 8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1-700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908

Business Address:
302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 750-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENSEN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006