Yeung, Kam-Tong (CPSO#: 66084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4B, 4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G2
Phone: 647-348-2218
Fax: 647-348-2298
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Canada
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: 416-285-3670
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kam-Tong Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yeung ( CPSO# 66084 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 64751 )

Business Address:
Senior's Health Centre
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-6050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAM-TONG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1997