Yeung, Latifa Tse Fung (CPSO#: 69247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Health Centre Site
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road, 12th Level
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 105
4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 298-2088
Fax: (416) 298-2188
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.T.F. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Yeung ( CPSO# 69247 )

Business Address:
Scarborough & Rouge Hospital Centenary Site
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road, 12th Level
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
Suite 105
4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone Number: (416) 298-2088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LATIFA TSE FUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999