Yeung, Rae Suk-Man (CPSO#: 58127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8964
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAE SUK-MAN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1988