Yeung, Raymond Yiu Ming (CPSO#: 64301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Anaesthesia
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2110
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 64301 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2110

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND YIU MING YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1995