Yim, Conrad Chi Yiu (CPSO#: 66723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7653
Fax: (905) 804-7741
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONRAD CHI YIU YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1998