Yim, Daniel (CPSO#: 59309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Finch Avenue East
North York ON  M2N 7J5
Phone: (416) 222-5057 Ext. 23
Fax: (416) 222-8009
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Yim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yim ( CPSO# 59309 )

Business Address:
78 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 7J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-5057

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989