Yim-Lee, Famy Lauren (CPSO#: 61172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: Yim, Famy (used until: 28 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Yim-Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yim-Lee ( CPSO# 61172 )

Business Address:
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 726-9755

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAMY LAUREN YIM-LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM-LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990