Yin, Alan Zheng Liu (CPSO#: 70239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite #309
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 335-3308
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Z. L. Yin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yin ( CPSO# 70239 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 335-3308

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN ZHENG LIU YIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998