Yin, Yiqing (CPSO#: 87937)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tianjin Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012