Ying, Ivan Shouchen (CPSO#: 90917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

491 Church St., 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y2C6
Canada
Phone: 4164631500
Fax: 4164636577
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying and Loh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying ( CPSO# 90917 )
Dr. M. Loh ( CPSO# 95646 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2064

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Business Address:
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2

Business Address:
491 Church Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN SHOUCHEN YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013