Yip, Clarwyn (CPSO#: 68217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 782-1536
Fax: (416) 782-0595
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clarwyn Yip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yip ( CPSO# 68217 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
507 - 960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 782-1536

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARWYN YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998