Yip, Florence Sue-Lune (CPSO#: 59610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 28
3833 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1V 5L6
Phone: (416) 291-0980
Fax: (416) 297-9666
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence S.L. Yip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yip ( CPSO# 59610 )

Business Address:
Unit 28
3833 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1V 5L6
Phone Number: (416) 291-0980

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORENCE SUE-LUNE YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989