Yip, Jeanne Chi-Ying (CPSO#: 88434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Yee Hong Centre For Geriatric Care
5510 Mavis Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 568-0333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeanne Yip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yip ( CPSO# 88434 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services Oakville
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Yee Hong Centre for Geriatric Care
5510 Mavis Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 568-0333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANNE CHI-YING YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2011