Yip, Lisa Y-Yee (CPSO#: 67850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
425 University Avenue East
Suite O
Waterloo ON  N2K 4C9
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John C. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Yip ( CPSO# 67850 )
Dr. J. Yang ( CPSO# 66432 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 01 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA Y-YEE YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998