Yip, Melissa (CPSO#: 80255)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1755 Rene-Laennec Boulevard Laval QC H7M 3L9
Date Received: 19 Jul 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2016