Yiu, Wendy Wing Sze (CPSO#: 65561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B2
Phone: (416) 923-8838
Fax: (416) 923-8820
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Yiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yiu ( CPSO# 65561 )

Business Address:
27 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 923-8838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY WING SZE YIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993