Ylanko, Veli Juhani (CPSO#: 26795)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:University of Turku, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2011