Yoganathan, Pradeepa (CPSO#: 87399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Toronto Eye Care
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: (416) 748-8582
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
Suite #208
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-3937
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoganathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yoganathan ( CPSO# 87399 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
2056 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 208
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRADEEPA YOGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010