Yogeswaran, Kumaresan (CPSO#: 84524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 112
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 554-0094
Fax: (905) 554-0076
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Yogeswaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yogeswaran ( CPSO# 84524 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
112 - 379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 554-0094

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMARESAN YOGESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOGESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010