Yohanathan, Lavanya (CPSO#: 101523)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017