Yolles, Linda Anne (CPSO#: 61243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Pleasant Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4T 1K2
Phone: (416) 967-4446
Fax: (416) 967-9406
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANNE YOLLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOLLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990