Yoneyama, Norma Jane (CPSO#: 59674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Phone: 905 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Yoneyama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yoneyama ( CPSO# 59674 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMA JANE YONEYAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YONEYAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989