Yoo, John Heung Joon (CPSO#: 64014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Suite B3-433
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8457
Fax: (519) 685-8567
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Yoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yoo ( CPSO# 64014 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B3-433
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8457

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HEUNG JOON YOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993