Yoo, Shi-Joon (CPSO#: 64776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 03 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6037
Fax: (416) 813-8389
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Feb 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHI-JOON YOO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. YOO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. YOO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. YOO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. YOO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. YOO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1999
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Dec 1999