Yoon, Robert Young Ill (CPSO#: 59791)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002