Yosef, Hosney Mohamed Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 53232)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 1988