Yoshida, Kenneth M (CPSO#: 59288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Suite 104
316 George Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P4
Phone: (519) 336-6765
Fax: (519) 336-7319
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia,ON
N7T 6S3
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5517
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH M YOSHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHIDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 1988 to 12 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 1993 to 07 Jun 1993
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989