Yoshida, Winifred Ruth (CPSO#: 65165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5C9
Phone: (416) 234-1987
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas J. Ing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yoshida ( CPSO# 65165 )
Dr. D. Ing ( CPSO# 63916 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Campus
P M C C 3-522
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5237

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINIFRED RUTH YOSHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHIDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993