Yoshijima, Sunao (CPSO#: 56272)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 May 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Tokushima, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 1987