Yoshinaga, Keiichiro (CPSO#: 82163)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kagoshima Daigaku Igakubu, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2005 to 12 Apr 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006