You, John Myeung-Sae (CPSO#: 70936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 235
Fax: 647-362-4554
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. You Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. You ( CPSO# 70936 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Toronto ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MYEUNG-SAE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1999