You-Ten, Fung Voon Kong (CPSO#: 75047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. FVK You-Ten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. You-Ten ( CPSO# 75047 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FUNG VOON KONG YOU-TEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU-TEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005