Young, Alix Marie (CPSO#: 51973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: Alix Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Young ( CPSO# 51973 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIX MARIE YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983