Young, Beverly (CPSO#: 70496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6206
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zinman and Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zinman ( CPSO# 72655 )
Dr. B. Young ( CPSO# 70496 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
UG 26
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4475

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLY YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 09 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2001