Young, David Clarence (CPSO#: 33776)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Gyn, IWK Health Centre 5850/5980 University Ave Halifax NS B3H 2W1
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017