Young, David Clark (CPSO#: 26388)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012