Young, Donald John (CPSO#: 78520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD JOHN YOUNG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YOUNG is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. YOUNG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUNG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. YOUNG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YOUNG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YOUNG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Aug 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Jun 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018