Young, Eric Robert (CPSO#: 27450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 5121 Lochside Drive, Victoria BC V8Y 2G2
Date Received: 13 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2015