Young, Hibbert Thomas (CPSO#: 86005)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Manitouwadge Medical Clinic 1 Clinic Rd. Manitouwadge, ON P0T 2C0
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 May 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017