Young, James Gordon (CPSO#: 28416)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 19, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. James Gordon Young, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. James Gordon Young:

2). Acknowledge that I have no intention to apply again for registration in Ontario, and I undertake to advise the College should I intend to re-apply.
3).Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with an investigation by the College pursuant to Section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.
4).agree that should I re-apply to resume the practice of medicine in Ontario, the College shall have the right to proceed with the Section 75 investigation in which investigators were appointed on or about May 8, 2009.
6). Acknowledge and agree that should a referral of specific allegations to the Discipline Committee be made in relation to the terms of this Undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario will be entitled to introduce this Undertaking as evidence at a hearing before the Discipline Committee, whether in relation to preliminary motions (as referred to above) or otherwise within the hearing.
7). consent and understand that this undertaking shall be information on the College’s register that is available to the public.