Young, Jennifer Patricia (CPSO#: 59903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Young ( CPSO# 59903 )

Business Address:
305 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-4111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER PATRICIA YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989