Young, Jennifer Suzanne (CPSO#: 85629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5128
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer S. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Young ( CPSO# 85629 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 588-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 14 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jennifer Suzanne Young may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Young holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will expire on  the  earlier  of  the
                  following times: 

                  (i)   on August 31, 2019;
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Young no longer holds the academic appointment at the rank
                        of  Assistant Professor in the Department  of  Paediatrics  at  the
                        University of Toronto; or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Young's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report  indicating that Dr. Young's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on September 1, 2010.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph  2  above, this  certificate  will,  if  not  extended  by  the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2019.