Young, John Gordon (CPSO#: 33777)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 136 Dorothea Drive Ottawa, ON K1V 7C7
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017