Young, John Gordon (CPSO#: 51972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1S1
Phone: (416) 465-3113
Fax: (416) 465-3113
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

412 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1T3
Canada
Phone: 416-465-3113
Fax: 416-465-3113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  June  29,  2011,  the  following  is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Gordon Young, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Young to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  John  Young  has voluntarily restricted  his  practice  to  addition
                  medicine with the exception  of managing acute complications of addiction
                  such  as  withdrawal, and has voluntarily  relinquished  his  prescribing
                  privileges   with   respect   to  the  following  drugs,  substances  and
                  preparations set out in the corresponding  regulations,  as  amended from
                  time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X