Young, Lionel Trevor (CPSO#: 54575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 23636
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Trevor Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Young ( CPSO# 54575 )

Business Address:
Suite 4248
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Suite 806
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIONEL TREVOR YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010