Young, Stephanie Lynne (CPSO#: 65617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21099
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Finch Weston Xray and US
2100 Finch Ave. W., Suite 212
Toronto
Weston ON  M3N 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 644-0347
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Young ( CPSO# 65617 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LYNNE YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993