Young Tai, Kin Fan Wu (CPSO#: 51381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue Suite 19-231B
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5312
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.F.W. Young Tai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Young Tai ( CPSO# 51381 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 19-231M
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5312

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIN FAN WU YOUNG TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG TAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1987